MD SB622 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB730
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-11 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-11 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an individual to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain travel, hospitality, and entertainment expenses paid or incurred in the State by the individual during taxable years 2022 and 2023 under certain circumstances; providing that the credit may not be allowed for certain travel expenses for which the individual claimed a certain federal deduction; requiring the Department of Commerce, on application by an individual, to issue a tax credit certificate in a certain amount; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Corderman [R] | Sen. Mary Carozza [R] | Sen. George Edwards [R] | Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] |
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Johnny Salling [R] | Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB730 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
HB1273 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
HB1273 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Subjects
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Commerce, Department of
Comptroller
Conventions
Food
Hotels and Motels
Income Tax
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Transportation
Commerce, Department of
Comptroller
Conventions
Food
Hotels and Motels
Income Tax
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 754 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0622?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0622f.pdf |