MD SB612 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Carroll County to borrow not more than $48,450,000 in order to finance the construction, improvement, or development of certain public facilities in Carroll County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds in like par amount; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
2021-04-12SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-04-12SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2021-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {734964/1 Adopted
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2021-03-16HouseReferred Appropriations
2021-03-12SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-03-11SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-03-11SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-03-10SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2021-02-02SenateHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-29SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB1131 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback