MD SB611 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing in Calvert County a special event (charity) beer, wine and liquor (on-sale) license; specifying the type of organization or group of individuals to which the Board of License Commissioners may issue the license, subject to limitations; specifying that the license authorizes a holder to hold and sell alcoholic beverages at a specified event to benefit a person or organization in dire need of financial assistance; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event (Charity) Beer, Wine and Liquor License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Dyson) {403226/1 Adopted |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Dyson) Adopted |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Dyson) Adopted |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Dyson) Adopted |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Calvert County
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Nonprofit Organizations
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Calvert County
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Nonprofit Organizations
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse