MD SB611 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that each State procurement contract include a clause that requires the contractor to meet a specified degree of minority business enterprise participation under specified circumstances; authorizing the Board of Public Works to debar a person from contracting with the State for 1 year if the Board finds that the person knowingly violated a contract clause requiring a specified degree of minority business enterprise participation; etc.
Title
Minority Business Enterprise Participation - Contracts, Debarment, and
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn | |
2011-02-25 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/SB0611.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/sb/sb0611f.pdf |