MD SB61 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to provide certain safety and workforce development training for its operations training workforce and its maintenance workforce; requiring the Administration's annual report on the implementation of the conversion of the State's transit bus fleet to zero-emission buses to include a plan that ensures certain employee protections and a certification that the Administration is adhering to the plan; etc.
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Zero-Emission Buses (Zero-Emission Bus Transition Act Revisions)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-40) |
2022-04-06 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-07 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation Appropriations |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB10 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Apprentices
Buses
Contracts
Job Training
Mass Transit
Pollution
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Safety
State Employees
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Work, Labor, and Employment
Apprentices
Buses
Contracts
Job Training
Mass Transit
Pollution
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Safety
State Employees
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 7 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |