MD SB61 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that the Noncustodial Parent Employment Assistance Pilot Program include documentation of a noncustodial parent's compliance status at 14 days after the effective date of a certain consent agreement; and altering certain Program evaluation reporting requirements.
Title
Child Support - Noncustodial Parent Employment Assistance Pilot Program - Documentation and Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/18 at 3:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-09-27 | Senate | Pre-filed |