MD SB61 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing references to the "Chesapeake 2000 Agreement" in specified provisions of law relating to forest lands and the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund and substituting references to the "2014 Chesapeake Bay Watershed Agreement"; requiring that the Trust Fund be utilized to support State and local watershed implementation plans by targeting limited financial resources on the most effective nonpoint source pollution control projects and to improve the health of Atlantic Coastal Bays and tributaries; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Forest Lands and the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Miscellaneous Corrections and Clarifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {464532/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Bridges and Tunnels
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Conservation
Counties
Environmental Matters
Fees
Forests and Parks
Highways
Natural Resources - Generally
Pollution
Rivers and Streams
Sediment Control
Wetlands
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Conservation
Counties
Environmental Matters
Fees
Forests and Parks
Highways
Natural Resources - Generally
Pollution
Rivers and Streams
Sediment Control
Wetlands