MD SB61 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a clerk of a court to provide without charge a copy of specified papers or records requested by an active armed forces member or by the United States government if the copy is to be used in connection with a claim of the member against the United States government; and requiring a clerk of a court to provide without charge a copy of specified marriage records of an active armed forces member that are requested under specified circumstances.
Title
Active Armed Forces Member - Exemption From Payment of Fees for Certain Court Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-20 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {358371/1 Report Adopted |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Clerks of Court
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Federal Government
Fees
Land Records
Public Employees
Records
Vital Records
Clerks of Court
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Federal Government
Fees
Land Records
Public Employees
Records
Vital Records