MD SB606 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore County to approve the transfer of a Class B or Class D license in an eligible transferor district existing on a certain date to another election district under certain circumstances; prohibiting the Board from authorizing the transfer of more than a certain number of licenses out of an eligible transferor district; repealing a certain transfer schedule of Class B and Class D licenses from Election District 15; etc.
Title
Baltimore County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Transfers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {453925/1 Adopted |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {843621/1 Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB460 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 752
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 13 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 13 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |