MD SB606 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 700
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 700
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail Fund to be used to maintain and construct trails for off-highway recreational vehicles on certain land; requiring the Secretary of Natural Resources to administer the Fund; requiring the Comptroller to distribute 25% in fiscal year 2019, and 50% in fiscal year 2020 and each year thereafter, of the revenue from the excise tax imposed on certain certificates of title issued for certain off-highway recreational vehicles to the Fund; etc.
Title
Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Excise Titling Tax - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 700 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {440615/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {559035/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Comptroller
Excise Tax
Highways
Interest
Licenses
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Taxes - Transportation
Treasurers
Excise Tax
Highways
Interest
Licenses
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Taxes - Transportation
Treasurers