MD SB600 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that certain mental health care providers, administrators of certain programs, and certain employees of administrators have immunity from liability for certain actions related to harm to or from certain patients; and providing that the Maryland Department of Health is a "reporting agency" for the purpose of certain provisions of law governing public-private partnerships under certain circumstances.
Title
Health – Mental Health Care Provider Immunity and Establishment of Specialty Tertiary Care Psychiatric Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB732 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-27 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Civil Actions and Procedures
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Liability
Mental and Behavioral Health
Privatization
Public Health
Reports
Sunset
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Liability
Mental and Behavioral Health
Privatization
Public Health
Reports
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 5 | 609.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |