MD SB6 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB73
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-20 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-20 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to require an individual appointed by the Governor to fill a vacancy in the office of Delegate or Senator in the General Assembly to serve for the remainder of the term if the vacancy occurs after a certain date; requiring that a special election be held at the same time as a certain regular statewide election to fill a vacancy in the office of Delegate or Senator in the General Assembly if the vacancy occurs on or before a certain date; etc.
Title
General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB6 (Carry Over) 2021-03-20 - Hearing canceled
HB265 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
HB265 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Constitutional Amendments
Elections
General Assembly
Governor
Public Officials
State Government - General Assembly
Time
Voting
Elections
General Assembly
Governor
Public Officials
State Government - General Assembly
Time
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
XVII - Quadrennial Elections | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
III - Legislative Department | 13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |