MD SB599 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting certain law enforcement agencies from receiving a weaponized aircraft, drone, or vehicle, a destructive device, a firearm silencer, or a grenade launcher from a federal military surplus program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Surplus Military Equipment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-12HouseHearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-04HouseReferred Judiciary
2021-03-03SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-02SenateCommittee Amendment {618376/1 Adopted
2021-02-26SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
2021-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {618376/1
2021-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-02-02SenateHearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-02SenateHearing canceled
2021-01-29SenateHearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-29SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety3521(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback