MD SB599 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each county board of education, public institution of higher education, and hospital to establish a policy on or before July 1, 2020 that limits immigration enforcement on the premises to the fullest extent possible consistent with federal and State law based on certain guidelines established by the Attorney General; and requiring the Attorney General, in consultation with certain stakeholders, to develop certain guidelines on or before December 31, 2019.
Title
Immigration Enforcement - County Boards of Education, Public Institutions of Higher Education, and Hospitals - Policies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Attorney General
Communications
Education, Boards of
Federal Government
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Higher Education
Hospitals
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Residency
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Communications
Education, Boards of
Federal Government
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Higher Education
Hospitals
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Residency
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials