MD SB597 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified exemption from recordation and transfer taxes so as to provide that a transfer of a controlling interest in a real property entity is not subject to recordation and transfer taxes if the transfer of the real property owned by the real property entity between the same transferor and transferee of the controlling interest under the same circumstances would have been exempt under specified provisions of law; etc.
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - Exemptions
Sponsors
Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. James DeGrange [D] | Sen. George Edwards [R] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] | Sen. Andrew Serafini [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {179435/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Associations
Business Trusts
Corporations
Exemptions
Interest
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Real Property
Recordation
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax
Business Trusts
Corporations
Exemptions
Interest
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Real Property
Recordation
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax