MD SB591 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for the amount of qualified business income of the individual deducted under the federal income tax; providing for the continuation of the subtraction modification if the provisions of ยง 199A of the Internal Revenue Code are repealed or terminate; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Business Income

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28SenateHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-28SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback