MD SB588 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to issue a Class C beer, wine, and liquor license in a certain area of the 40th alcoholic beverages district in Baltimore City to the holder of a Class C beer and light wine license; authorizing the Board to issue a Class A-7 beer, wine, and liquor license in a certain area of the 40th alcoholic beverages district in Baltimore City under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - 40th District - Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2023-04-10 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2023-03-18 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {293322/1 Adopted |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB886 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
License Commissioners, Boards of
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
License Commissioners, Boards of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 1603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 2005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |