MD SB588 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a county board to award credit for time spent by a high school student toward a high school diploma or a postsecondary credential for work-based training and classroom instruction completed under a youth apprenticeship program; authorizing certain applicants for legislative scholarships to be enrolled in Workforce Development Sequence courses or be participating in an apprenticeship training program; authorizing certain recipients of a senatorial scholarship to use the scholarship to reimburse certain expenses; etc.
Title
Career Education Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Floor Committee Amendment {514435/1 Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {204938/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {204938/1 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Apprentices
Appropriations
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Continuing Education
Counties
Curriculum
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Fees
General Assembly
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Minors
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Schools
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Students
Sunset
Tuition
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth
Apprentices
Appropriations
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Continuing Education
Counties
Curriculum
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Fees
General Assembly
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Minors
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Schools
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Students
Sunset
Tuition
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth