MD SB584 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB498
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, in collaboration with certain agencies, to collect certain information each year; requiring the Department to establish and maintain a certain database on the Department's website; requiring the Department to publish on the Department's website a Student Horizon Scorecard by October 1, 2022, and each October 1 thereafter; requiring the Student Horizon Scorecard to include certain information and be distributed by local school systems to high school students by October 31 each year; etc.
Title
Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2021)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB584 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
HB46 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
HB46 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Apprentices
Armed Forces
Continuing Education
Data
Demographics
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
internet
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Loans
Minorities
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Work, Labor, and Employment
Apprentices
Armed Forces
Continuing Education
Data
Demographics
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
internet
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Loans
Minorities
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0584?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0584f.pdf |