MD SB582 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a personal liability clause in a commercial lease or associated document is unenforceable if, as the result of certain proclamations relating to the outbreak of COVID-19, a commercial tenant was required to cease operations or close to the public and the commercial tenant's default occurred between March 23, 2020, and September 30, 2020; providing that the period of the declared state of emergency and the catastrophic health emergency may not be used to calculate the time limitation on filing a certain action; etc.
Title
Commercial Tenants – Personal Liability Clauses – Enforceability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-12) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {338870/1 Adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 10:00 a.m. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB719 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Commerce and Business
Commercial Property
Court Costs
Courts
COVID-19
Crimes and Punishments
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Executive Orders
Fees
Health
Judgments
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Safety
Sunset
Time
Commerce and Business
Commercial Property
Court Costs
Courts
COVID-19
Crimes and Punishments
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Executive Orders
Fees
Health
Judgments
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Safety
Sunset
Time