MD SB580 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 752
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 752
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Officer and Community Wellness Training Grant Fund to provide grants to local law enforcement agencies for Mental Health First Aid for Public Safety training and Critical Incident Stress Management peer support training; and requiring the Governor's Office Of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to administer the Fund and report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31 each year on the uses of the Fund.
Title
Public Safety - Officer and Community Wellness Training Grant Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Jack Bailey [R] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Sen. Dawn Gile [D] |
Sen. William Folden [R] | Sen. Michael Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 752 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2023-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {753527/1 Adopted |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2023-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {673922/1 Adopted |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB751 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 753
Subjects
Appropriations
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Grants
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Safety
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Grants
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Safety
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 4 | 1012 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |