MD SB577 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB453
Note: Carry Over of previous SB826
Note: Carry Over of previous SB826
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to encourage the establishment and expansion of makerspaces throughout the State; authorizing the Corporation to award certain financial assistance to local governments, certain designees of local governments, and certain nonprofit entities for the establishment of makerspaces in the State; requiring the Governor, for fiscal year 2023, to include $275,000 in the annual budget bill for the Makerspace Initiative Fund; etc.
Title
Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {357972/1 Adopted |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB577 (Carry Over) 2021-04-06 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
HB443 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-18 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
SB826 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
HB443 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-18 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
SB826 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Economic and Community Development
Equipment
Grants
Industry and Technology
Loans
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Baltimore City
Budgets
Economic and Community Development
Equipment
Grants
Industry and Technology
Loans
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 473 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 474 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 475 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 476 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 477 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 9 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |