MD SB575 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that certain provisions of law governing the reporting and investigation of workers' compensation insurance fraud claims apply to certain employers who participate in a governmental self-insurance group for workers compensation and to certain employers who self-insure for workers' compensation; providing that certain provisions of law governing fraudulent insurance acts that apply to insurers also apply to certain governmental self-insurance groups and certain employers under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Self-Insured Employers - Suspected Fraud Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-30 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {837077/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Evidence
Fraud
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Interest
Investigations and Inquiries
Liability
Privacy
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Evidence
Fraud
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Interest
Investigations and Inquiries
Liability
Privacy
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation