MD SB575 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the qualifications individuals are required to meet to be licensed to practice clinical alcohol and drug counseling, to qualify to practice as a licensed graduate alcohol and drug counselor under supervision for a limited period of time, to qualify as a certified associate counselor-alcohol and drug, or to qualify as a certified supervised counselor-alcohol and drug; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Alcohol and Drug Counselors - Qualifications and Practice Limitations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368 |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2015-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {946784/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {274330/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Counselors
Examinations
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Job Training
Licenses
Substance Abuse
Work, Labor and Employment
Examinations
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Job Training
Licenses
Substance Abuse
Work, Labor and Employment