MD SB573 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of State to furnish a State flag to drape the casket of an eligible decedent; establishing the process for a State flag to be claimed after burial; providing that only one flag may be provided for the death of an eligible decedent; and prohibiting the Secretary of State from procuring a flag that is not wholly produced in the United States except under certain circumstances.
Title
General Provisions - State Flag - Casket of an Eligible Decedent
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-26 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-25 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {433128/1 Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB756 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Death
Flags
Funerals
General Assembly
Governor
Judges
Rules and Regulations
Secretary of State
Standards and Best Practices
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Symbols
Flags
Funerals
General Assembly
Governor
Judges
Rules and Regulations
Secretary of State
Standards and Best Practices
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Symbols
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 7 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |