MD SB572 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB278
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for up to a certain amount each year for certain individuals who are receiving certain benefits under the Social Security Act, or who are at least 65 years old and are not employed full time; establishing certain limits on the subtraction modification for certain taxable years; prohibiting income included in certain subtraction modifications from being included under the subtraction modification; etc.
Title
Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB733 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-26 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
SB278 (Carry Over) 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
SB278 (Carry Over) 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Subjects
Comptroller
Elderly Persons
Exemptions
Income Tax
Retirement
Rules and Regulations
Social Security
Taxes - Income
Veterans
Elderly Persons
Exemptions
Income Tax
Retirement
Rules and Regulations
Social Security
Taxes - Income
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0572?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0572f.pdf |