MD SB571 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing, on or after October 1, 2016, specified interested persons to enter into a binding nonjudicial settlement agreement with respect to a matter involving a trust; providing that the nonjudicial settlement agreement is valid only to a specified extent; authorizing an interested person to request a court to make specified determinations with respect to the agreement; etc.
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Nonjudicial Settlement Agreements
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2016-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-04-11 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2016-04-09 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |