MD SB569 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 509
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund to provide law enforcement agencies with funding to pay for testing of sexual assault evidence collection kits by forensic laboratories; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the Fund and to establish and publish procedures for the distribution of funding; limiting the use of the funds to the equipment, supplies, personnel, and outsourcing necessary for the testing of sexual assault evidence collection kits; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund - Established

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 509
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFloor Amendment {433229/1 (Senator King) Adopted
2019-03-18SenateMotion Returned Second Reading (Senator King) Adopted
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {838676/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0569&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0569f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0569t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_509_sb0569t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0569_43322901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0569_83867601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0569.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0569_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0655.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0569_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1256.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback