MD SB564 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB378
Note: Carry Over of previous SB533
Note: Carry Over of previous SB533
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-27 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-27 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the felony of theft of a handgun; and establishing a penalty for theft of a handgun of, for a first conviction, 2 to 5 years of imprisonment or a fine of up to $1,000 or both and, for a second or subsequent conviction, imprisonment for 5 to 10 years or a fine of up to $2,500 or both.
Title
Criminal Law - Theft of a Handgun
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB564 (Carry Over) 2023-02-27 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
SB533 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
SB533 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Guns
Penalties and Sentences
Repeat Offenders
Theft
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Guns
Penalties and Sentences
Repeat Offenders
Theft
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 7 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0564?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0564f.pdf |