MD SB562 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring at least $120,000 of $1,000,000 in impact grants distributed to Prince George's County from certain proceeds of video lottery terminals to be distributed to the Town of Forest Heights.
Title
Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Local Impact Grants
Sponsors
Sen. Obie Patterson [D] | Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Boundaries
Community Development
Equipment
Gaming
Grants
Horse Racing
Jurisdiction
Lottery
Prince George's County
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Sports and Recreation
Community Development
Equipment
Gaming
Grants
Horse Racing
Jurisdiction
Lottery
Prince George's County
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Sports and Recreation