MD SB561 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from committing a certain crime of violence against another person when the person knows or believes that the other person is pregnant; providing that a person who violates the Act is guilty of a felony and, in addition to any other penalty imposed for the underlying crime of violence, on conviction is subject to imprisonment not exceeding 10 years; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law – Crime of Violence Against Pregnant Person – Enhanced Penalty (Laura and Reid’s Law)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 388
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseDelegates Clippinger, Atterbeary, and Malone
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-08HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2019-04-08SenateSenators Zirkin, Hough, and Ready
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-08SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-04-08SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
2019-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {332611/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-03-15HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-15HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (46-1)
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {838378/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0561&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0561f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0561t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0561e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0561_83837801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0561_33261101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0561_71302601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0561_82352501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0001/sb0561.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0561_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0578.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0561_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0561_82352501.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1508.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1617.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1449.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback