MD SB558 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1023
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the list of organizations in certain counties that may be licensed to operate not more than five instant ticket lottery machines to include certain fraternal and sororal organizations in Carroll County, provided that the organization is not a high school or college fraternity or sorority or any other organization the membership of which is restricted wholly or largely to certain students or graduates; etc.
Title
Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB1023 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - First Reading Senate Rules
HB818 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-29 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
HB818 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-29 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0558?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0558f.pdf |