MD SB558 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Highway Administration to issue a seasonal exceptional milk hauling permit that authorizes specified axle configurations and specified increased weight limits from March 1 until June 30 annually under specified circumstances.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Norman [R] | Sen. Gail Bates [R] | Sen. Bob Cassilly [R] | Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] |
Sen. George Edwards [R] | Sen. Justin Ready [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-06 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Emergency Bills
Highway Administration, State
Milk Products
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Highway Administration, State
Milk Products
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections