MD SB558 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program to provide investment in local housing and businesses focusing on areas where modest investment will have an appreciable impact; establishing the types of community enhancement projects eligible to receive Program funds; providing that community enhancement projects may be located in more than one political subdivision; requiring the Governor to include a $12,000,000 appropriation to the Fund in the annual budget bill for fiscal years 2018 through 2022; etc.
Title
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Cassilly) {393720/1 Rejected (14-28) (Y: 14 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Cassilly) {393720/1 Rejected (14-28) (Y: 14 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2016-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2016-03-31 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator McFadden) {893323/1 Adopted |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator McFadden) {283724/1 Adopted |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator McFadden) Adopted |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Cassilly) {393720/1 Rejected (14-28) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {959338/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Special Order until 3/30 (Senator McFadden) Adopted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {959338/1 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Community Facilities and Services
Contracts
Economic and Community Development
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Financial Institutions
Foreclosure
Grants
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Investments
Liens
Loans
Mortgages
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Real Estate
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Securities
Transportation
Urban Renewal
Work, Labor and Employment
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Community Facilities and Services
Contracts
Economic and Community Development
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Financial Institutions
Foreclosure
Grants
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Investments
Liens
Loans
Mortgages
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Real Estate
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Securities
Transportation
Urban Renewal
Work, Labor and Employment