MD SB556 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-15)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each manager and supervisor in the Legislative and Executive branches of State government to immediately report to the appointing authority or head of the principal unit certain incidents of workplace bullying; providing that it is the intent of the State to educate all employees about bullying, ensure that bullying is not tolerated, and deal appropriately with bullying in the workplace; requiring certain human resources departments to collect and share data on complaints and reports; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
2019-03-06SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback