MD SB55 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 713
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 713
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the period of time within which a person is required to file a Maryland estate tax return for the purpose of allowing a surviving spouse to take into account the deceased spousal unused exclusion amount to be consistent with the time for making a federal election.
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Portability - Time Period for Election
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 713 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2023-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {753629/1 Adopted |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2023-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB179 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 714
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 7 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |