MD SB548 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, in coordination with the Maryland Department of Health, to establish procedures for the administration of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention Youth Risk Behavior Survey/Youth Tobacco Survey to public middle school and high school students in the State; requiring the State Department of Education, in coordination with the Maryland Department of Health, to include in the survey at least five questions on adverse childhood experiences or positive childhood experiences; etc.
Title
Public Schools - Centers for Disease Control and Prevention Surveys - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-31) |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {934332/1 Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB771 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Data
Diseases
Education, State Department of
Health
Health, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Public Schools
Publications
Records
Reports
Students
Time
Tobacco and Nicotine
Youth
Data
Diseases
Education, State Department of
Health
Health, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Public Schools
Publications
Records
Reports
Students
Time
Tobacco and Nicotine
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 420 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |