MD SB546 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposing certain requirements on a person who takes possession of a catalytic converter, including requirements to record certain information and execute a certain document; prohibiting a person from taking possession of a catalytic converter if its identifying information has been manually altered; and prohibiting a person, in certain circumstances, from possessing catalytic converters or their parts if they have been previously installed on a motor vehicle.
Title
Vehicle Equipment – Transfer of Catalytic Converter – Regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Examinations
Fingerprinting
Forms
Fraud
Identification
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Rules and Regulations
Signatures
State Documents
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Fingerprinting
Forms
Fraud
Identification
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Rules and Regulations
Signatures
State Documents
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 22 | 421 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |