MD SB546 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a summary of each nutrient management plan be filed and updated with the Department of Agriculture at certain times; authorizing the Department to require an updated summary to take the form of an annual implementation report; requiring a manure broker to provide certain information to a certain person; requiring a person who holds a certain certificate or license to comply with certain reporting requirements and deadlines related to implementation of the Phosphorus Management Tool; etc.
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (24-15) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-40) (Y: 93 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-41) (Y: 95 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-40) (Y: 93 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-41) (Y: 95 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-40) |
2019-04-05 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (24-15) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | Delegates Lafferty, Stein, and Lehman |
2019-04-04 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-04 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senators Pinsky, Young, and Kagan |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (95-41) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments {310911/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {604032/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Animals
Archives
Birds
Boundaries
Certifications
Chemical Tests
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Construction
Crimes and Punishments
Eastern Shore
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Examinations
Farmland
Fees
Fertilizers
Fines
Forms
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Job Training
Licenses
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Pollution
Prices
Privacy
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Rules and Regulations
State Universities and Colleges
Storage
Transportation
Water
Weights and Measures
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Animals
Archives
Birds
Boundaries
Certifications
Chemical Tests
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Construction
Crimes and Punishments
Eastern Shore
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Examinations
Farmland
Fees
Fertilizers
Fines
Forms
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Job Training
Licenses
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Pollution
Prices
Privacy
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Rules and Regulations
State Universities and Colleges
Storage
Transportation
Water
Weights and Measures