MD SB544 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the statewide information technology master plan developed by the Secretary of Information Technology include a cybersecurity framework; and requiring that the Secretary consider materials developed by the National Institute of Standards and Technology in developing or modifying the cybersecurity framework.
Title
Statewide Information Technology Master Plan - Inclusion of Cybersecurity Framework - Requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Electronic Government
Information Technology, Department of
Safety
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Safety
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology