MD SB543 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB663

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-09 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting cemeteries located in Charles County from certain sediment control, stormwater management, and forest conservation requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charles County - Cemeteries - Sediment Control, Stormwater Management, and Forest Conservation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-09SenateHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-02-09SenateHearing canceled
2023-02-07SenateHearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment

Same As/Similar To

SB663 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment4102(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment4204(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources51602(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback