MD SB541 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring county boards of education, nonpublic schools, and certain contracting agencies to require an applicant for a position involving direct contact with minors to submit certain information; requiring the county board, nonpublic school, or contracting agency to conduct a review of the employment history of a certain applicant before hiring the applicant; requiring the county board, nonpublic school, or contracting agency to check certain eligibility of an applicant for a substitute position involving direct contact with minors; etc.
Title
Education - Personnel Matters - Child Sexual Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {304337/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Arbitration
Archives
Certifications
Child Abuse and Neglect
Civil Actions
Claims
Collective Bargaining
Communications
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Data
Discipline
Disclosure
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government
Evidence
Forms
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Liability
Libel and Slander
Licenses
Minors
Notices
Oaths
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Employees
Public Information
Public Safety
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Sexual Offenses
Signatures
Social Services
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment
Agents and Brokers
Arbitration
Archives
Certifications
Child Abuse and Neglect
Civil Actions
Claims
Collective Bargaining
Communications
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Data
Discipline
Disclosure
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government
Evidence
Forms
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Liability
Libel and Slander
Licenses
Minors
Notices
Oaths
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Employees
Public Information
Public Safety
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Sexual Offenses
Signatures
Social Services
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment