MD SB540 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB955
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the State from entering into an agreement that waives the State's authority under ยง 401 of the federal Clean Water Act as part of exercising the State's authority and carrying out the State's duties under the federal Clean Water Act and State law, including the State's authority and duties related to the federal relicensing of the Conowingo Dam.
Title
Federal Clean Water Act - Authority of State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB427 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
SB955 (Carry Over) 2020-02-16 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
SB955 (Carry Over) 2020-02-16 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 353 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0540?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0540f.pdf |