MD SB540 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from conducting or contracting for cosmetic animal testing in the development of a cosmetic beginning October 1, 2020; prohibiting a person from selling, offering for sale, or transporting within the State certain cosmetics beginning October 1, 2021; providing for certain penalties for certain violations of the Act; requiring a certain court to consider certain information in making a certain determination regarding the amount of a civil penalty; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback