MD SB540 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Board of Regents of Morgan State University from entering into any contract for student housing that is located in the 1500 block of Havenwood Road in Baltimore City unless the Hillen Road Improvement Association approves and the developer executes a specified memorandum of understanding; requiring the Board to give notice to specified committees of the General Assembly if it enters into a contract for student housing; specifying priorities in the distribution of housing to students; etc.
Title
Morgan State University - Student Housing
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-0) (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (113-22) (Y: 113 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-03 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McConkey) {213227/1 Rejected (46-86) (Y: 46 N: 86 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (113-22) (Y: 113 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-03 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McConkey) {213227/1 Rejected (46-86) (Y: 46 N: 86 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (113-22) |
2016-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-09 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {213227/1 Rejected (46-86) |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {124863/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2016-04-07 | House | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2016-03-28 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {593026/2 Adopted |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {754030/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Associations
Baltimore City
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Higher Education
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Law Enforcement
Minorities
Notices
Shopping Centers
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Baltimore City
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Higher Education
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Law Enforcement
Minorities
Notices
Shopping Centers
State Universities and Colleges
Students