MD SB54 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the purpose of a certain clean energy loan program established by a county or municipality to include loans to certain residential and commercial property owners to finance grid resilience projects when installed with energy efficiency projects or renewable energy projects; and requiring a certain ordinance or resolution that establishes a certain clean energy loan program to include certain eligibility requirements for certain grid resilience projects.
Title
Local Government – Clean Energy Loan Programs – Grid Resilience Projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kelley) Adopted |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {167070/1 (Finance Committee) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {167070/1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 1 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 1 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 1 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 1 | 1104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |