MD SB54 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a certain surface mining permittee, on discovery of a sudden subsidence of the surface of the land, to immediately implement appropriate safety measures to protect public health and safety; requiring a certain permittee to permanently replace a water supply within a zone of dewatering influence within 45 days of the date on which the permittee knew of the water supply failure; authorizing a certain surface mining permittee to seek reimbursement for certain water supply replacement costs under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 137
2019-04-03SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-04-03SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-29HouseFavorable with Amendments {610017/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-29HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-12HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-02-11SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-02-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {254938/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-06SenateSpecial Order until 2/7 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
2019-02-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {254938/1 Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateLaid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2019-02-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {254938/1
2019-02-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-09SenateHearing 1/22 at 4:00 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-10-09SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0054&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0054f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0054t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0054e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_137_sb0054e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0054_25493801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0054_61001701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/sb0054.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0054_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0176.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0054_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1047.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1130.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback