MD SB54 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-31 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-31 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of aviation gasoline for purposes of the motor fuel tax; providing that "aviation gasoline" is gasoline that is used to propel gasoline-powered aircraft and does not include gasoline used to propel a motor vehicle; etc.
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2017-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {815965/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-21 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Pre-filed |