MD SB537 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 736
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the number of years before the end of the term of a video lottery operation license that a licensee is required to provide certain notice of intent to renew the license and is authorized to apply for renewal; providing for the term of a renewed license; requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to renew a certain license unless the Commission makes a certain finding; requiring the Commission, under certain circumstances, to provide a licensee a certain hearing; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-16SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 736
2023-04-10SenatePassed Enrolled
2023-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (102-33)
2023-04-10HouseConference Committee Report {893523/1 Adopted
2023-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2023-04-10SenateConference Committee Report {893523/1 Adopted
2023-04-10SenateHouse Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Hartman and Patterson)
2023-04-10SenateHouse Refuses Recede
2023-04-08HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Hartman and Patterson)
2023-04-08HouseHouse Refuses Recede
2023-04-08HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Guzzone, King and Salling)
2023-04-08HouseSenate Requests House Recede
2023-04-08HouseSenate Refuses Concur House Amendments
2023-04-07SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Guzzone, King and Salling)
2023-04-07SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2023-04-07SenateSenate Refuses Concur House Amendments
2023-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (100-35)
2023-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2023-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {543327/1 Adopted
2023-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2023-03-20HouseHearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-03-20HouseReferred Ways and Means
2023-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2023-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2023-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {593325/1 Adopted
2023-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2023-02-03SenateHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-02-03SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government91A-13(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-17(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-27(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-30(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0537?ys=2023RS
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0537f.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0537t.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0537e.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/Chapters_noln/CH_736_sb0537e.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0537_59332501.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0537_54332701.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0537_89352301.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes_comm/sb0537_b&t.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes_comm/sb0537_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/Senate/0599.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/House/1426.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/House/1085.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/Senate/1347.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback