MD SB537 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 563
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 563
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that publication expenses related to unofficial legislative newsletters may be paid by an authorized candidate campaign committee, rather than a campaign account of a campaign finance entity, of an incumbent under certain circumstances; providing that an official electronic legislative newsletter may include a link to a social media account only under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
General Assembly - Legislative Newsletters - Publication Expenses and Links to Social Media Accounts
Sponsors
Sen. George Edwards [R] | House Legislative Ethics Committee | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Melony Griffith [D] |
Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] | Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 563 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-1) |
2020-03-18 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2020-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 9:00 a.m. |
2020-03-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 10:00 a.m. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {734333/1 Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {734333/1 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB701 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Subjects
Campaign Financing
Communications
Elections
Electronic Communication
Ethics
General Assembly
internet
News Media
Open Government
Political Candidates
Political Committees
Prices
Public Information
Public Officials
Publications
Revenue and Taxes
Voting
Communications
Elections
Electronic Communication
Ethics
General Assembly
internet
News Media
Open Government
Political Candidates
Political Committees
Prices
Public Information
Public Officials
Publications
Revenue and Taxes
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 13 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 13 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 13 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 13 | 409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 514.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |